MN HF4975 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Laid on table
Hearing: May 3 @ 9:00 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Laid on table
Hearing: May 3 @ 9:00 am Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture, commerce, and energy supplemental budget bill.
Title
Agriculture, commerce, and energy supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Laid on table |
2024-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2024 |
2024-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-24 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4942 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Second reading