MN SF4942 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4975
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4975
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Agriculture, Commerce, Energy, Utilities, Environment and Climate supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus Agriculture, Commerce, Energy, Utilities, Environment and Climate supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4975 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2024-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-30 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4975 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Authors added Stephenson, Kraft and Vang