MN HF5237 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education supplemental budget bill.
Title
Education supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-26 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Pinto |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-04-15 | House | Author added Edelson, Jordan, Clardy, Greenman, Sencer-Mura, Pursell and Hill |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF5252 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance