MN HF776 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 263 04/22/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 263 04/22/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgments Recognition Act enacted and recommended for passage by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws.
Title
Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgments Recognition Act enacted and recommended for passage by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Paul Kohls [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Secretary of State Chapter 263 04/22/10 | |
2010-04-22 | Governor approval | |
2010-04-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-04-19 | Presentment date | |
2010-04-19 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2010-04-15 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2010-04-15 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-04-15 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2010-04-15 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. Calendar SF612 | |
2010-03-24 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-03-24 | House: Third reading | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-03-23 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-22 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-22 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-02-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Justice |