MN HF819 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Unfair ticket sales prohibited.
Title
Unfair ticket sales prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Andrew Falk [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Terry Morrow [D] | Rep. Nora Slawik [D] | Rep. Phillip Sterner [D] |
Rep. Kurt Zellers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-11 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-07 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2009-05-07 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-07 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-06 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-06 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-06 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2009-05-06 | House: Conference committee report | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-06 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2009-04-29 | House: Senate conferees Latz, Skogen, Jungbauer | |
2009-04-29 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: Senate conferees Latz; Skogen; Jungbauer | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: House conferees Atkins; Lillie; Zellers | |
2009-04-27 | House: House conferees Atkins, Lillie, Zellers | |
2009-04-27 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-04-27 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2009-04-27 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-04-22 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-20 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2009-04-16 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-16 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF759 | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-04-07 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-04-07 | House: Third reading | |
2009-03-30 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2009-03-26 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-03-19 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-03-19 | House: Second reading | |
2009-03-09 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2009-02-26 | House: Author added Hornstein | |
2009-02-16 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor |