MN HF92 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; law enforcement use of force reported, Officer-Involved Death Review Board established, Community-Led Public Safety Coordinator established, grants established to promote community-based crisis intervention, grants established to promote community healing, standards established for crisis intervention and mental illness crisis training for peace officers, autism training for peace officers developed and implemented, civil right to vote restored for an individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if no incarceration is imposed, notice required, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Public safety; law enforcement use of force reported, Officer-Involved Death Review Board established, Community-Led Public Safety Coordinator established, grants established to promote community-based crisis intervention, grants established to promote community healing, standards established for crisis intervention and mental illness crisis training for peace officers, autism training for peace officers developed and implemented, civil right to vote restored for an individual upon release from incarceration or upon sentencing if no incarceration is imposed, notice required, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2020-06-18 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Bernardy |
2020-06-16 | House | Author added Noor |
2020-06-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Second reading