MN SF1126 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - House: Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - House: Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax-forfeited property uses and conveyances procedures modifications
Title
Tax-forfeited property uses and conveyances procedures modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Mee Moua [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-28 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Taxes | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-05-04 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-04 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-04-29 | Senate: Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended for further proceedings | |
2009-04-29 | Senate: Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-04-29 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-05 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |