MN SF1208 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance (MA) claims and liens against estates provisions modifications
Title
Medical assistance (MA) claims and liens against estates provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Leo Foley [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Mee Moua [D] |
Sen. Steven Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-21 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-18 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-05-18 | House: Third reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2009-05-17 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-16 | House: Second reading | |
2009-05-16 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-15 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1482 | |
2009-05-15 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-05-15 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: General Orders: To pass Rule 22.3 suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-26 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-05 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |