MN SF1284 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful gambling regulation provisions modifications
Title
Lawful gambling regulation provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Claire Robling [R] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Senate concurred and repassed bill | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2009-05-15 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2009-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2009-05-15 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2009-05-15 | House: Amendments offered | |
2009-05-15 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2009-05-15 | House: Amended | |
2009-05-14 | House: Second reading | |
2009-05-14 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-13 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1511 | |
2009-05-13 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed Rules suspended, lie-over waived | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Author added Wiger | |
2009-05-12 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-05-04 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-04 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-04-06 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight |