MN SF2416 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Eaton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Eaton
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution calling for an end to the cold genocide and forced organ harvesting from Falun Gong practitioners in China
Title
Resolution calling for an end to the cold genocide and forced organ harvesting from Falun Gong practitioners in China
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Sen. Chris Eaton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Author added Eaton |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Author added Howe |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Authors added Laine; Hoffman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2500 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Author added Bennett