MN SF2541 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indian tribal government owned watercraft, off-highway vehicles and snowmobiles motor vehicle registration and licensing requirement exemptions
Title
Indian tribal government owned watercraft, off-highway vehicles and snowmobiles motor vehicle registration and licensing requirement exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Kubly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | House: Senate file first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-04-27 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-27 | House: Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |