MN SF2737 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 333 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 333 05/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus agriculture and veterans policy bill
Title
Omnibus agriculture and veterans policy bill
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Dille [R] | Sen. Lisa Fobbe [D] | Sen. Gary Kubly [D] | Sen. Dan Skogen [D] |
Sen. James Vickerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 333 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-14 | Governor's action Approval 05/13/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-11 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-10 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-10 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-10 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-10 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-10 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-10 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2010-05-08 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-04 | Senate: House conferees Juhnke; Koenen; Magnus | |
2010-05-03 | House: House conferees Juhnke, Koenen and Magnus | |
2010-04-28 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-04-28 | House: Senate conferees Skogen, Dille, Vickerman | |
2010-04-28 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-28 | Senate: Senate conferees Skogen; Dille; Vickerman | |
2010-04-28 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-04-28 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2010-04-27 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-04-27 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-04-27 | House: Point of order raised, ruled well taken | |
2010-04-27 | House: Amended | |
2010-04-27 | House: Amendments offered | |
2010-04-27 | House: Point of order raised, ruled not well taken | |
2010-04-27 | House: Amended | |
2010-04-26 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar | |
2010-04-26 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-26 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-04-21 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2678 | |
2010-04-21 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-04-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Referred to Finance |