MN SF2887 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pratt
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pratt
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wood dehydrator appropriation to help reduce the amount of wood that is infested by emerald ash borer in this state
Title
Wood dehydrator appropriation to help reduce the amount of wood that is infested by emerald ash borer in this state
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2899 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy