MN SF3507 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3377, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3377, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriation and modification
Title
Environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriation and modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3377, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3377 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Governor's action Approval