MN HF3377 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources trust fund; previous appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Environment and natural resources trust fund; previous appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 94 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 94 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-04-15 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-04-15 | Governor approval | |
2024-04-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 83 | |
2024-04-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3507 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3507, now on General Orders |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Hussein |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Third reading |
2024-03-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 7, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Authors added Rehm, Tabke, Freiberg, Carroll and Clardy |
2024-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-02-22 | House | Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Lee, K. |
2024-02-19 | House | Authors added Virnig, Pursell, and Bierman |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-15 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3507 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3377, SF indefinitely postponed