MN SF4260 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Elections supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus Elections supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Elections |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4411 (Similar To) 2024-04-30 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 2, 2024