MN SF4435 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Jobs and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special Olympics USA 2026 games Explore Minnesota appropriation
Title
Special Olympics USA 2026 games Explore Minnesota appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Susan Pha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Development |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4123 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Feist