MN SF4525 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4605
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4605
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties, cities and townships acceptance of documents or signatures electronically, by mail or by facsimile authorization
Title
Counties, cities and townships acceptance of documents or signatures electronically, by mail or by facsimile authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4605 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4605 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 92