MN SF4625 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Lucero
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Lucero
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal forfeiture process provision
Title
Criminal forfeiture process provision
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. James Carlson [D] | Sen. Bonnie Westlin [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Author added Lucero |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Authors added Westlin; Oumou Verbeten |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4673 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Authors added Hudson and Feist