MN SF4782 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 12:30 pm Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 12:30 pm Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Cannabis Management modifications and appropriations
Title
Office of Cannabis Management modifications and appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] |
Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Authors added Klein; Oumou Verbeten; Kupec; Murphy |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4757 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection