MN SF5159 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Manufacturers prohibition from limiting pharmacy access to 340B drugs
Title
Manufacturers prohibition from limiting pharmacy access to 340B drugs
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Authors added Kupec; Klein; Morrison; Utke |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chief author added Mann |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chief author stricken Hauschild |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4991 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Author added Rehm