MN SF653 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed physical therapists medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons authorization
Title
Licensed physical therapists medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Scott Newman [R] |
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF211 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF211 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Author added Mariani