MO HB103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding transportation
Title
Changes the laws regarding transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] | Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-10 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2013-05-17 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 39 |
2013-05-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 14 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 7 |
2013-05-16 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-05-16 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - KELLEY(127), RICHARDSON, RIZZO |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS MUNZLINGER,, KEHOE, LIBLA, LEVOTA, JUSTUS |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-05-16 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SSA 1 FOR SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED AYES: 33 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 14, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SSA 1 FOR SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 2, 2013, 9:30AM, PERSHING GALLERY |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 1, 2013, 8:00AM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 16 |
2013-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues in Agriculture(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |