MO HB1039 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a retiree of the Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System to have his or her health insurance or long-term care insurance premium deducted from his or her retirement allowance
Title
Allows a retiree of the Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System to have his or her health insurance or long-term care insurance premium deducted from his or her retirement allowance
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-06-18 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-02 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-02 | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 5, 9:00AM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MARCH 8, 2012, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-01 | Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S) | |
2012-02-08 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-08 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 158 NOES: 000 | |
2012-02-07 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |