MO HB1104 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elections by requiring a voter to provide photo identification
Title
Changes the laws regarding elections by requiring a voter to provide photo identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-19 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 9:50AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM | |
2012-04-10 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-04-05 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-13 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-09 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 054 | |
2012-02-09 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 054 | |
2012-02-07 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-20 | Prefiled (H) |