MO HB114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to award educational credits to a veteran for certain courses that were a part of his or her military training or service
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to award educational credits to a veteran for certain courses that were a part of his or her military training or service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 13, 2013, 1:30 PM, SCR 2 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 25, 2013, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 5 |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 |
2013-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |