MO HB1198 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Laid Over (H) - HSA 1 FOR HA 1 ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Laid Over (H) - HSA 1 FOR HA 1 ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding prevailing wages
Title
Changes the laws regarding prevailing wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Laid Over (H) - HSA 1 FOR HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-30 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-06 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-30 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |