MO HB13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Title
Appropriates money for real property leases and related services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 13 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 13 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 13 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 13 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 13 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 144 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Taken Up - AYES: 143 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection, pursuant to HR 1400 |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |