MO HB1306 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Public Safety (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Public Safety (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the definition of "police animal" as it relates to crimes committed against these animals to include a dog, horse, or other animal used by public or private search and rescue units or agencies
Title
Revises the definition of "police animal" as it relates to crimes committed against these animals to include a dog, horse, or other animal used by public or private search and rescue units or agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-02 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1306&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1306I.htm |