MO HB1414 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the protection of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the protection of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1414 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: HB 1414 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House: HB 1414 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2020-05-14SenateHouse Message (H)
2020-05-14SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 2
2020-05-14SenateHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 138 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2020-05-14SenateTaken Up
2020-05-13SenateReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-13SenateExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-12SenateReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-12SenateSenate Message (S)
2020-05-12SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1. SA 2. SA 3
2020-05-12SenateSS Adopted (S)
2020-05-12SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-12SenateTaken Up
2020-05-06SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-05-04SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-04SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-05-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-04SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-05-04SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 3:45 p.m., Monday, May 4, Joint Committee Room
2020-05-01SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-04-07SenateSecond read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S)
2020-03-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 2
2020-03-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-10HousePerfected (H)
2020-03-10HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-04HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1414&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201S.06C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201S.08F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3201S.08T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/038.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5405121017-1031.pdf#1022
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.022.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback