MO HB143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding hotline calls reporting suspected child abuse and neglect to the Children's Division within the Department of Social Services
Title
Changes the laws regarding hotline calls reporting suspected child abuse and neglect to the Children's Division within the Department of Social Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-10 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2011-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |