MO HB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from discriminating in providing compensation based on gender for the same work.
Title
Prohibits employers from discriminating in providing compensation based on gender for the same work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB145&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0457H.01I.pdf |