MO HB1603 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the exercise commonly known as "jumping jacks" as the official state exercise
Title
Designates the exercise commonly known as "jumping jacks" as the official state exercise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 5 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 4 |
2014-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |