MO HB1646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to landowners' obligation to control brush adjacent to county roads
Title
Modifies provisions relating to landowners' obligation to control brush adjacent to county roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1646 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1646 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 24, 2018, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee (S) - Local Government and Elections |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |