MO HB1667 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for environmentally sustainable construction for certain state-funded buildings
Title
Establishes requirements for environmentally sustainable construction for certain state-funded buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-11 | Referred: Energy and Environment (H) | |
2010-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1667&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1667I.htm |