MO HB1667 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Title
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-13 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-13 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: HB 1667 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2022-07-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2022-05-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 107 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2022-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 8, 2022, SCR 1, 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, whichever is later. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-02-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 5 |
2022-02-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-02-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |