MO HB1668 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person to obtain a United States Olympic Committee special license plate to benefit the Springfield Olympic Community Development Program
Title
Allows a person to obtain a United States Olympic Committee special license plate to benefit the Springfield Olympic Community Development Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, 8:00 A.M., SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |