MO HB1806 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding county classifications and annexations by certain cities
Title
Changes the laws regarding county classifications and annexations by certain cities
Sponsors
Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-11 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 121 NOES: 34 | |
2010-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 5 | |
2010-05-11 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 149 NOES: 5 | |
2010-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-27 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1 | |
2010-04-27 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2010-03-30 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - No Action Taken (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |