MO HB1810 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a fund for matching school district expenditures of reserve moneys to increase teacher salaries
Title
Establishes a fund for matching school district expenditures of reserve moneys to increase teacher salaries
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |