MO HB186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding county officers
Title
Changes the laws regarding county officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-07 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-04-26 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-18 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2011-04-14 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-01 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |