MO HB1934 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-29 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-29 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Public School Retirement System of Missouri.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Public School Retirement System of Missouri.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: HB 1934 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions(S) |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |