MO HB1941 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designates various highways, a pedestrian and bicycle lane, and a bridge
Title
Designates various highways, a pedestrian and bicycle lane, and a bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 9 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 141 NOES: 11 | |
2010-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-26 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-26 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-14 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-07 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 8:30A.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |