MO HB2001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Title
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-06-22 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-04-30 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 000 | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 150 NOES: 000 | |
2012-04-25 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2012-04-24 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2012-04-24 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-03 | Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - FRIDAY, APRIL 6, 2012 8:00 A.M., SCR 2 | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 5, 2012 8:00 A.M., SCR 2 | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 4, 2012 8:00 A.M., SCR 2 | |
2012-04-02 | Hearing Cancelled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 2, UPON EVENING ADJOURNMENT AND CANCELLED TUESDAY, APRIL 3, 8:30AM | |
2012-03-27 | Second Read and Referred: Appropriations (S) | |
2012-03-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-20 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - TIME LIMIT OF 6 HOURS TOTAL DEBATE DIVIDED EQUALLYAMONG BOTH SIDES FOR DEBATE ON PERFECTION | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |