MO HB2017 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To appropriate money for capital improvement and other purposes for the several departments of state government
Title
To appropriate money for capital improvement and other purposes for the several departments of state government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 2017 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2017 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 2017 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27 |
2016-06-16 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-16 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-05 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-05 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-05 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 139 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-05 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, May 13, 2016, thirty minutes upon morning recess, SCR 2 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, upon morning recess, SCR 2, Tuesday, May 3, 2016, thirty minutes upon morning recess, SCR 2 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-04-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 22 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |