MO HB2021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government for planning and capital improvements
Title
Appropriates money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government for planning and capital improvements
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-24 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 15 |
2014-05-08 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 133 NOES: 14 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 4 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 7, 2014, upon morning recess, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2014-05-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-05-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-05-01 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2014-05-01 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-29 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |