MO HB2092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the distribution of county sales taxes in certain counties
Title
Changes the laws regarding the distribution of county sales taxes in certain counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2092&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2092I.htm |