MO HB2098 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that risk coverages procured by a member of an entity will not be deemed to constitute a contract, purchase, or expenditure of public funds for which competitive bids must be solicited
Title
Specifies that risk coverages procured by a member of an entity will not be deemed to constitute a contract, purchase, or expenditure of public funds for which competitive bids must be solicited
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-02-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2098&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2098I.htm |