MO HB2114 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the State of Missouri recognizes the designations of Prisoner of War and Missing in Action as valid descriptions of casualty status and category classification for military personnel
Title
Specifies that the State of Missouri recognizes the designations of Prisoner of War and Missing in Action as valid descriptions of casualty status and category classification for military personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2010-02-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |