MO HB2221 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for providing copies of medical records
Title
Modifies provisions for providing copies of medical records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |