MO HB2345 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the office of administration to conduct post-award negotiations with vendors
Title
Allows the office of administration to conduct post-award negotiations with vendors
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |